ME LD411 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Fair Judicial Outcomes
Title
An Act To Ensure Fair Judicial Outcomes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and REJECTED and the Bill INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Representative HARNETT from the Committee on JUDICIARY Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Reported Out: REF TO HHS |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Referred To: HHS |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: REFERRED |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-02 | Joint | Public Hearing Held: TABLED |
2021-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 8, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=411&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0295&item=1&snum=130 |