ME LD2244 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Department of the Secretary of State, Bureau of Motor Vehicles' Motor Vehicle Dealer Display Area and Licensing Requirements Working Group
Title
An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Department of the Secretary of State, Bureau of Motor Vehicles' Motor Vehicle Dealer Display Area and Licensing Requirements Working Group
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2024-03-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2024-03-07 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2024-03-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS |
2024-03-05 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported by Senator CURRY of Waldo for the Joint Standing Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business pursuant to Resolve 2023, chapter 19, section 5. |