ME LD2223 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Direct the Department of Health and Human Services to Amend Rules and Establish a Study Group Related to Funding and Reimbursement for Mental Health Crisis Resolution Services
Title
Resolve, to Direct the Department of Health and Human Services to Amend Rules and Establish a Study Group Related to Funding and Reimbursement for Mental Health Crisis Resolution Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-03-20 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-03-14 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-03-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-21 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |