ME LD204 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Membership of the Midcoast Regional Redevelopment Authority Board of Trustees
Title
An Act Regarding the Membership of the Midcoast Regional Redevelopment Authority Board of Trustees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2011-06-28 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-28 | (H) COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2011-06-16 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-15 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) The House INSISTED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers and JOINED in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. | |
2011-06-14 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Senator RECTOR of Knox moved that The Senate RECEDE and CONCUR To to INDEFINITE POSTPONMENT OF Bill and accompanying papers Subsequently Senator RECTOR of Knox asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion. On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-19) and ASKED for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-14 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 177 (Yeas 76 - Nays 69 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-06-14 | (H) On motion of Representative PRESCOTT of Topsham the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-06-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-09 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Representative PRESCOTT of Topsham moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-19) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-31 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-19) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator RECTOR of Knox Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-19) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-01-27 | (S) On motion by Senator Rector of Knox REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT | |
2011-01-27 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=204&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0054&item=1&snum=125 |