ME LD1928 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Update and Clarify the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Title
An Act To Update and Clarify the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-960), in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-960) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-960). |
2022-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-01-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2022-01-18 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 18, 2022. |