ME LD1876 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Abandoned Motor Vehicle Storage Fees and Lienholder Notification
Title
An Act Regarding Abandoned Motor Vehicle Storage Fees and Lienholder Notification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-765), in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-765) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-765). |
2022-02-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-02-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-01-27 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-01-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |