ME LD1842 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Education and Training Regarding Harassment for Legislators, Legislative Staff and Lobbyists
Title
An Act To Require Education and Training Regarding Harassment for Legislators, Legislative Staff and Lobbyists
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-387) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-484). |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator CUSHING of Penobscot. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-387) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-484) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-484) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-387) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-387). |
2018-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-387). |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-387) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-02-20 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Bill and accompanying papers REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |