ME LD1819 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 26: Producer Margins, a Major Substantive Rule of the Maine Milk Commission
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 26: Producer Margins, a Major Substantive Rule of the Maine Milk Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) RELEASED. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) HELD at the Request of Representative MARTIN of Eagle Lake. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Sent for concurrence. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-841), in concurrence.. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-841) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President Pro Tem. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-28 | (S) On motion by Senator SHERMAN of Aroostook, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, Report READ. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-841) | |
2012-03-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-02-15 | (S) On motion by Senator Sherman of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Representative EDGECOMB for the Maine Milk Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |