ME LD1814 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Transfer the St. Francis Water District to the Town of St. Francis and To Repeal the St. Francis Water District Charter
Title
An Act To Transfer the St. Francis Water District to the Town of St. Francis and To Repeal the St. Francis Water District Charter
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Mark Bryant [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] |
Rep. Ann Matlack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-03-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-433). |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-433). |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-433) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 15, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |