ME LD1762 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Law Regarding Expiration of Disability Plates and Placards and Fees for Recycler Licenses
Title
An Act To Amend the Law Regarding Expiration of Disability Plates and Placards and Fees for Recycler Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-11-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-11-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on November 30, 2021. |