ME LD1758 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - (S) PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - (S) PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Eliminate the Deposit Requirements for Containers of Limited and Restricted Use Pesticides
Title
An Act To Eliminate the Deposit Requirements for Containers of Limited and Restricted Use Pesticides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-03-12 | (S) (32 -Yeas, 0 -Nays, 3 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-03-12 | (S) Roll Call Number 368 | |
2012-03-12 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-392) | |
2012-03-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-392). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-392) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-11 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-11 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | |
2012-01-10 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-01-10 | (S) On motion by Senator Sherman of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY | |
2012-01-10 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2012-01-10 | (S) Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY |