ME LD1746 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the 1998 Special Retirement Plan To Include Employees Who Work for the Office of Chief Medical Examiner
Title
An Act To Expand the 1998 Special Retirement Plan To Include Employees Who Work for the Office of Chief Medical Examiner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #467 (Y: 76 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #596 (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #596 (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) AND House Amendment "A" (H-894) in concurrence |
2022-03-31 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) and House Amendment "A" (H-894). |
2022-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, House Amendment "A" (H-894) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) was ADOPTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2022-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-24 | House | Later today assigned. |
2022-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland TABLED pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-424). |
2022-03-24 | House | On further motion of same Representative the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-424). |
2022-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-424). |
2022-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-424). |
2022-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 467 (Yeas 76 - Nays 59 - Absent 13 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 596 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 30, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |