ME LD1666 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - RELEASED.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Ensure the Successful Implementation of Proficiency-based Diplomas by Extending the Timeline for Phasing in Their Implementation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Ensure the Successful Implementation of Proficiency-based Diplomas by Extending the Timeline for Phasing in Their Implementation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Reconsider RC #706 (Y: 9 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #705 (Y: 9 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Enactment RC #704 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - Enactment RC #693 (Y: 116 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #695 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #694 (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09SenateRELEASED.
2018-06-26SenateHELD at the Request of Senator LANGLEY of Hancock.
2018-06-26SenateFAILED RECONSIDERATION
2018-06-26SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 706 Yeas 9 - Nays 18 - Excused 8 - Absent 0
2018-06-26SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin to RECONSIDER FAILED
2018-06-26SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 705 Yeas 9 - Nays 18 - Excused 8 - Absent 0
2018-06-26SenateMotion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin to Table until Later in Today's Session, pending RECONSIDERATION FAILED
2018-06-26SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin asked The Senate to RECONSIDER whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED Roll Call Requested
2018-06-26SenateRELEASED.
2018-06-26SenateHELD at the Request of Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin.
2018-06-26SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 704 Yeas 17 - Nays 12 - Excused 6 - Absent 0
2018-06-26SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2018-06-26SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2018-06-26SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-06-26HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-06-26HouseROLL CALL NO. 693 (Yeas 116 - Nays 7 - Absent 28 - Excused 0)
2018-06-26HouseSubsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-06-26HouseOn motion of Representative SAMPSON of Alfred, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-06-26HouseHELD at the Request of Representative SAMPSON of Alfred.
2018-06-26HouseSent for concurrence.
2018-06-26HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-06-25SenateRELEASED.
2018-06-21SenateHELD at the Request of Senator LANGLEY of Hancock.
2018-06-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-777) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-797) thereto
2018-06-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-777) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-797) thereto ADOPTED
2018-06-21SenateHouse Amendment "A" (H-797) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-777) READ and ADOPTED
2018-06-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-777) READ
2018-06-21SenateREAD ONCE
2018-06-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 695 Yeas 17 - Nays 16 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2018-06-21SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-777) Report ACCEPTED
2018-06-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 694 Yeas 16 - Nays 17 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2018-06-21SenateMotion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock to accept The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-778) Report FAILED
2018-06-21SenateReports READ
2018-06-20HouseRELEASED.
2018-06-19HouseHELD at the Request of Representative CHAPMAN of Brooksville.
2018-06-19HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-777) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-797) thereto.
2018-06-19HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-06-19HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-777) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-797) thereto was ADOPTED.
2018-06-19HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, House Amendment "A" (H-797) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-777) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-06-19HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2018-06-19HouseLater today assigned.
2018-06-19HouseSubsequently, on motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-777).
2018-06-19HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-777) was READ.
2018-06-19HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-06-19HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-06-19HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2018-06-19HouseLater today assigned.
2018-06-19HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2018-06-19HouseReports READ.
2018-05-02HouseCarried over to any special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-12-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2017-12-05HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on December 1, 2017.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1666&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1152&item=1&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1152&item=2&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1152&item=7&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1152&item=8&snum=128
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280067114&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=694
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280067114&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=695
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280067114&chamber=House&serialnumber=693
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280067114&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=704
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280067114&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=705
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280067114&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=706

Bill Comments

feedback