ME LD1624 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Pricing Disclosure Requirements and Oversight of Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Title
An Act Concerning Pricing Disclosure Requirements and Oversight of Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Beck [D] | Rep. Janice Cooper [D] | Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] | Rep. Thomas Longstaff [D] |
Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D] | Rep. Helen Rankin [D] | Rep. Charles Theriault [D] | Rep. Sharon Treat [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2014-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-24 | House | Subsequently, Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham WITHDREW his motion to TABLE. |
2014-03-24 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved that this item be TABLED until later in Today's Session pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2014-03-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-12-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2013-12-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1624&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1196&item=1&snum=126 |