ME LD1580 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Protections for Mobile Home Park Residents
Title
An Act To Provide Protections for Mobile Home Park Residents
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Rep. Joseph Perry [D] | Rep. Morgan Rielly [D] |
Rep. Amy Roeder [D] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo The Bill was REFERENCED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1580&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0483&item=1&snum=130 |