ME LD1576 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Certain Education Laws
Title
An Act To Amend Certain Education Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-585), in concurrence. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-585) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-585) |
2016-03-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-03-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cushing of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in concurrence. |
2016-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2016-01-26 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |