ME LD1574 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - (S) On motion by Senator Trahan of Lincoln, Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED IN CONCURRENCE Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - (S) On motion by Senator Trahan of Lincoln, Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED IN CONCURRENCE Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Tax Water Used by Hydroelectric Facilities
Title
An Act To Tax Water Used by Hydroelectric Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Herbert Clark [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. John Martin [D] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Rep. Roger Sherman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | (S) On motion by Senator Trahan of Lincoln, Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED IN CONCURRENCE Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) On motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) On motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls, TABLED pending REFERENCE. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed. |
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1574&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1156&item=1&snum=125 |