ME LD1549 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Maine Forest Advisory Board
Title
An Act To Establish the Maine Forest Advisory Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-19 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #426 (Y: 71 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - Recede And Concur RC #310 (Y: 76 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Recede And Concur RC #248 (Y: 68 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #320 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #224 (Y: 70 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - Recede And Concur RC #310 (Y: 76 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Recede And Concur RC #248 (Y: 68 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #320 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #224 (Y: 70 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-19 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 426V 71 having voted in the affirmative and 62 in the negative, with 17 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-07-19 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-07-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-07-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-385) thereto. |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-385) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-385) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-385) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Senate Amendment "A" (S-268) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) was ADOPTED AND INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-268) thereto in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 310 (Yeas 76 - Nays 60 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-268) thereto. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator JACKSON of Aroostook. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-268) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-268) thereto READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-268) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From Adoption of Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Senate RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) |
2021-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | Subsequently, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 248 (Yeas 68 - Nays 71 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | Motion of Speaker FECTEAU of Biddeford to RECEDE and CONCUR to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) FAILED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 320 Yeas 23 - Nays 11 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Senator DILL of Penobscot moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 224 (Yeas 70 - Nays 72 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-10 | House | Motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 20, 2021. |