ME LD1549 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide an Exemption for Incidentally Caught Lobsters
Title
An Act To Provide an Exemption for Incidentally Caught Lobsters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #270 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #205 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #205 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 270 (Yeas 106 - Nays 38 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator HASKELL of Cumberland. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-07 | Senate | (28 -Yeas, 7 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Number 205 |
2013-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator JOHNSON of Lincoln, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-07 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending the motion by Senator JOHNSON of Lincoln to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Senator JOHNSON of Lincoln moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-22 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Johnson of Lincoln REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES |
2013-05-21 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Committee on MARINE RESOURCES |