ME LD1542 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal and Replace the Kittery Water District Charter
Title
An Act To Repeal and Replace the Kittery Water District Charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-185), in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-185) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-185). |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-05-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 20, 2021. |