ME LD1520 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Terminate the Augusta Downtown Parking District
Title
An Act To Terminate the Augusta Downtown Parking District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 15, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |