ME LD1517 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Maine Workforce, Research, Development and Student Achievement Institute
Title
An Act To Establish the Maine Workforce, Research, Development and Student Achievement Institute
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-329). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-329). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-329) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 15, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |