ME LD1503 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Stop Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances Pollution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Stop Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances Pollution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - House - Recede And Concur RC #419 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2021-07-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-07-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-07-02HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2021-07-02HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-07-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 419 (Yeas 121 - Nays 2 - Absent 28 - Excused 0)
2021-07-02HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-432) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-393) thereto.
2021-07-02SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-07-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-432) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-393) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-07-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-432) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-393) thereto ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-393) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-432) READ and ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-432) was ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-432) in concurrence
2021-07-02SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2021-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2021-06-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-09HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2021-06-08SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2021-06-08SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-432), in concurrence.
2021-06-08SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-432) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-08SenateREAD ONCE.
2021-06-08SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-08HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-432).
2021-06-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2021-06-08HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2021-06-07JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2021-05-12JointVoted: OTP-AM
2021-05-12JointWork Session Held
2021-04-13HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-04-13HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on April 13, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1503&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1113&item=1&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1113&item=5&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1113&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1113&item=4&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN150302.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN150304.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN150305.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080415&chamber=House&serialnumber=419

Bill Comments 750

feedback