ME LD1495 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Help Veterans Who Are Caregivers of Children with Special Needs and of Family Members To Optimize Their Respite Hours
Title
An Act To Help Veterans Who Are Caregivers of Children with Special Needs and of Family Members To Optimize Their Respite Hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-12 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 12, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1495&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1105&item=1&snum=130 |