ME LD1471 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act Concerning Debarment from Contracts with the Department of Environmental Protection
Title
An Act Concerning Debarment from Contracts with the Department of Environmental Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-03 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-239) | |
2009-06-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-239) | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-05-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-239) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-05-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES. | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-05 | (S) On motion by Senator Goodall of Sagadahoc REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Committee on Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |