ME LD1425 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Dedicate a Portion of Route 6 from Lee to Springfield in Honor of Sgt. Blair Emery
Title
Resolve, To Dedicate a Portion of Route 6 from Lee to Springfield in Honor of Sgt. Blair Emery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-05-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-08 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021. |