ME LD1376 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove Barriers to Workforce Development in Alcohol and Drug Counseling
Title
An Act To Remove Barriers to Workforce Development in Alcohol and Drug Counseling
Sponsors
Rep. Gay Grant [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] |
Rep. Dillon Bates [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #384 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #399 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #399 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | Senate | LD 1376 In Senate, June 27, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 399V 142 having voted in the affirmative and 3 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-06-27 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-422), in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-422) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-422). |
2017-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-05-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-02 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-05-02 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-05-02 | House | The House RECEDED. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED From REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND On motion by Same Senator The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2017-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | The House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed. |