ME LD1374 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Assess and Improve the Availability of Child Care Services
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Assess and Improve the Availability of Child Care Services
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Frey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1374&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0953&item=1&snum=128 |