ME LD1373 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 466 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 466 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Keep All Maine Students Safe by Restricting the Use of Seclusion and Restraint in Schools
Title
An Act To Keep All Maine Students Safe by Restricting the Use of Seclusion and Restraint in Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] |
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Enactment RC #466 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #459 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #454 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Adopt Hbh-729 To Cah-545 RC #373 (Y: 78 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #407 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #267 (Y: 75 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Adopt Hah-558 To Cah-545 RC #266 (Y: 62 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #265 (Y: 74 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #459 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #454 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Adopt Hbh-729 To Cah-545 RC #373 (Y: 78 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #407 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #267 (Y: 75 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Adopt Hah-558 To Cah-545 RC #266 (Y: 62 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #265 (Y: 74 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 466 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 459 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report Accepted AND the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-729) thereto in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 454 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2021-06-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-729) thereto |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-729) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 373 (Yeas 78 - Nays 55 - Absent 18 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative MILLETT of Cape Elizabeth, House Amendment "B" (H-729) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative MILLETT of Cape Elizabeth, the House RECEDED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-17 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative MILLETT of Cape Elizabeth, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator SANBORN of Cumberland. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 407 Yeas 13 - Nays 21 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senator RAFFERTY of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 267 (Yeas 75 - Nays 61 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 266 (Yeas 62 - Nays 74 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative LYMAN of Livermore Falls, House Amendment "A" (H-558) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) was READ and FAILED ADOPTION. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) was READ. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 265 (Yeas 74 - Nays 63 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-10 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-06-10 | House | Representative BRENNAN of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-05 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 5, 2021. |