ME LD1274 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Sustain Emergency Medical Services throughout the State
Title
An Act To Sustain Emergency Medical Services throughout the State
Sponsors
Rep. John Tuttle [D] | Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] |
Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D] | Rep. Megan Rochelo [D] |
Rep. Peter Stuckey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-357) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-357) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-357) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-357) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-218). |
2013-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-218) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |