ME LD1261 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Camping Opportunities in Maine by Exempting Certain Campground Rental Fees from the Sales and Use Tax
Title
An Act To Improve Camping Opportunities in Maine by Exempting Certain Campground Rental Fees from the Sales and Use Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #209 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #103 (Y: 78 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #103 (Y: 78 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 209 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 103 (Yeas 78 - Nays 57 - Absent 16 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-24 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 24, 2021. |