ME LD1190 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Driver's License Suspensions for Nondriving-related Violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Driver's License Suspensions for Nondriving-related Violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #724 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #705 (Y: 129 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09Senatein concurrence
2018-07-09SenateLD 1190 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2018-07-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-07-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 705V 129 having voted in the affirmative and 15 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2018-07-09HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2018-06-20SenateOn Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-28SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
2017-06-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-27HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-532) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-550) thereto in concurrence
2017-06-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-532) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-550) thereto ADOPTED in concurrence
2017-06-27SenateHouse Amendment "A" (H-550) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-532) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-532) READ
2017-06-27SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-27SenateOn motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-06-27SenateReports Read
2017-06-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-23HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-532) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-550) thereto.
2017-06-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-532) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-550) thereto was ADOPTED.
2017-06-23HouseOn further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-550) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-532) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-532) was READ.
2017-06-23HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-23HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-23HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-06-22HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-22HouseLater today assigned.
2017-06-22HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2017-06-22HouseReports READ.
2017-03-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2017-03-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2017-03-28HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback