ME LD1148 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Increase Broadband Access in Private Nonmedical Institutions
Title
Resolve, To Increase Broadband Access in Private Nonmedical Institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] |
Rep. Holly Stover [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-18 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1148&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0826&item=1&snum=130 |