ME LD1104 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Time for Which a Temporary Motor Vehicle Registration Plate Is Valid
Title
An Act To Increase the Time for Which a Temporary Motor Vehicle Registration Plate Is Valid
Sponsors
Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Roland Martin [D] |
Rep. Wayne Parry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-05-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-04-20 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-04-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 18, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |