ME LD1084 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Operation of Pedal-powered Tour Vehicles
Title
An Act Regarding the Operation of Pedal-powered Tour Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2020-02-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-13 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1084&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0316&item=1&snum=129 |