ME LD1082 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Educational Opportunities by Exempting Children Who Attend Virtual Public Charter Schools from Immunization Requirements and Expanding Enrollment at Virtual Public Charter Schools
Title
An Act To Improve Educational Opportunities by Exempting Children Who Attend Virtual Public Charter Schools from Immunization Requirements and Expanding Enrollment at Virtual Public Charter Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #188 (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #85 (Y: 82 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #85 (Y: 82 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 188 Yeas 17 - Nays 15 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 85 (Yeas 82 - Nays 61 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |