ME LD1000 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Convene a Firearm Range Safety Working Group Within the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife
Title
Resolve, to Convene a Firearm Range Safety Working Group Within the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife
Sponsors
Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D] | Rep. Sally Cluchey [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator LaFOUNTAIN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative LANDRY of Farmington, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2023-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1000&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0636&item=1&snum=131 |