ME LD10 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Method of Creating or Severing Joint Tenancy
Title
An Act To Clarify the Method of Creating or Severing Joint Tenancy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-10 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-03-03 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-03 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-03-01 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-03-01 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2011-01-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-06 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2011-01-05 | (S) On motion by Senator Hastings of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY | |
2011-01-05 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Committee on JUDICIARY |