MD SJ4 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - - Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - - Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the compensation of the members of the members of the Judiciary in the State in accordance with Section 1-708 of the Courts and Judicial Proceedings Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland.
Title
Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | - Joint Resolution 2 | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President and the Speaker | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2010-02-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-24 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2010-03-03 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-02-12 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-02 | Hearing 2/5 at 10:00 a.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |