MD SJ3 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the goals and ideals of American Legion Day and calling on the people of Maryland to observe American Legion Day with appropriate programs and activities.
Title
Maryland American Legion Day
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] |
Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. George Della [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-02-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |