MD SB947 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Applying the provisions of the Charles County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights to Calvert County.
Title
Calvert County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |