MD SB932 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the collection of a DNA sample from a certain individual convicted of or charged with certain criminal offenses relating to firearms in accordance with certain regulations.
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection - Criminal Offenses Relating to Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Evidence
Genetics
Guns
Public Safety
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Evidence
Genetics
Guns
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 4 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 2 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |