MD SB932 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain defendants placed in private home detention as a condition of pretrial release from the requirement to pay a certain monitoring fee if the defendant qualifies as an indigent individual under certain circumstances or if a private home detention monitoring device is provided by the State or a local jurisdiction.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Surveillance
Fees
Home Detention
Indigent Persons
Pretrial Detention or Release
Electronic Surveillance
Fees
Home Detention
Indigent Persons
Pretrial Detention or Release