MD SB932 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Department of the Environment and the Department of Agriculture, to study and make recommendations regarding the impact of atrazine in the State; specifying the parameters of the study; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to report the findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2018, and to make the report available to the public on its Web site.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Boundaries
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Public Health
Reports
Agriculture, Department of
Boundaries
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Public Health
Reports