MD SB909 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "employer" to include Charles County under specified provisions of law; authorizing fire, emergency medical service, paramedic, and rescue employees to collectively bargain with specified counties and municipal corporations; altering a specified provision of law to provide that, with respect to Charles County, a memorandum of understanding between Charles County and a specified exclusive representative is subject to specified provisions concerning budgetary and fiscal procedures; etc.
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-14) (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-14) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {767679/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Budgets
Charles County
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Counties
County Commissioners
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Fire Protection
Local Government - Generally
Mediation
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Oaths
Public Local Laws
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signatures
Subpoenas
Work, Labor and Employment
Charles County
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Counties
County Commissioners
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Fire Protection
Local Government - Generally
Mediation
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Oaths
Public Local Laws
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signatures
Subpoenas
Work, Labor and Employment