MD SB908 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the process for appointing members of the Harford County Board of Education.
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
County Councils
County Executives
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Harford County
Minorities
Time
Voting
County Executives
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Harford County
Minorities
Time
Voting