MD SB9 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an individual under the age of 21 years from playing a table game or video lottery terminal in a video lottery facility; providing that it is a Code violation and a civil offense for an individual under the age of 21 years to play a table game or video lottery terminal in a video lottery facility; providing that a person who violates the Act shall be issued a citation; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; establishing procedures for the issuance of a citation under the Act; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appeals
Citations
Court Costs
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Fines
Forms
Gaming
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
State's Attorneys
Summonses
Trials
Youth
Citations
Court Costs
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Fines
Forms
Gaming
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
State's Attorneys
Summonses
Trials
Youth