MD SB88 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB372
Note: Carry Over of previous HB481
Note: Carry Over of previous HB481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution by requiring a candidate for Governor in a primary election to designate a candidate for Lieutenant Governor within 21 days after the primary election; requiring a candidate seeking a nomination for Governor by any method other than a primary election to designate a candidate for Lieutenant Governor at the time of filing a declaration of intent to seek nomination; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State at the next general election in November, 2022; etc.
Title
Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB88 (Carry Over) 2022-01-13 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
HB481 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB707 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB481 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB707 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Ballots
Certifications
Communications
Constitutional Amendments
Elections
Governor
Political Candidates
Public Officials
Time
Certifications
Communications
Constitutional Amendments
Elections
Governor
Political Candidates
Public Officials
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
II - Executive Department | 1B | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0088?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0088f.pdf |