MD SB867 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a judge to extend the term of a protective order for a period not to exceed 2 years from the date the extension is granted under specified circumstances; requiring the judge to provide notice to all affected persons eligible for relief and the respondent and to hold a hearing before extending the term of a protective order; etc.
Title
Domestic Violence - Protective Order - Extension
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Michael Lenett [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Special Order 4/12 (Delegate Levy) Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-04-06 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2010-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-19 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Senate Rules |