MD SB857 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to allow certain dispensaries and dispensary agents to acquire, possess, transfer, transport, sell, distribute, or dispense edible cannabis products for use by a qualifying patient or caregiver; requiring the Commission, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, to require a dispensary to comply with certain requirements that the Commission determines are necessary to include requiring a permit for the dispensing of edible cannabis products; etc.
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Edible Cannabis Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {268972/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Cannabis
Caregivers
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Food
Health
Laboratories
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Patients
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Cannabis
Caregivers
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Food
Health
Laboratories
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Patients
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Transportation